We all know that while doing maths we encounter many difficulties when dividing,

multiplying, adding, or subtracting large numbers. It is a very enormous problem that we

face when we do maths.

Sometimes we also don’t have much time for calculating large numbers and we get tired

of it and leave that particular option, This is the foremost purpose why we lose our marks

in maths as we can’t calculate fast sometimes.

So I have got some tricks that will help you in the future.

**Adding large numbers**

Adding large numbers just in your head can be difficult. This method shows how to

analyze this process by making all the numbers a multiple of 10. Here is an example:

644 + 238

While these numbers are hard to contend with, rounding them up will make them more

manageable. So, 644 becomes 650, and 238 becomes 240.

Now, add 650 and 240 together. The total is 890. To find the answer to the original

equation, it must be determined how much we added to the numbers to round them up.

650 – 644 = 6 and 240 – 238 = 2

Now, add 6 and 2 together for a total of 8

To find the answer to the original equation, 8 must be subtracted from the 890.

890 – 8 = 882

So the answer to 644 +238 is 882.

**Division tricks**

Here’s a quick way to know when a number can be evenly divided by these certain

numbers:

10 if the number ends in 0

9 when the digits are added together and the total is evenly divisible by 9

8 if the last three digits are evenly divisible by 8 or are 000

6 if it is an even number and when the digits are added together the answer is evenly divisible by 3

5 if it ends in a 0 or 5

4 if it ends in 00 or a two-digit number that is evenly divisible by 4

3 when the digits are added together and the result is evenly divisible by the number 3

2 if it ends in 0, 2, 4, 6, or 8

**Percentage**

Finding a percentage of a number can be somewhat tricky, but thinking about it in the

right terms makes it much easier to understand. For instance, to find out what 5% of

235 is, follow this method:

Step 1: Move the decimal point over by one place, 235 becomes 23.5.

Step 2: Divide 23.5 by number 2, the answer is 11.75. That is also the answer to the original equation.

**Tough multiplication**

When multiplying large numbers, if one of the numbers is even, divide the first number in

half, and then double the second number. This method will solve the problem quickly. For

instance, consider

20 x 120

Step 1: Divide the 20 by 2, which equals 10. Double 120, which equals 240.

Then multiply your two answers together.

10 x 240 = 2400

The answer to 20 x 120 is 2,400.

**Multiplying numbers that end in zero**

Multiplying numbers that end in zero is quite simple. It involves multiplying the other

numbers together and then adding the zeros at the end. For instance, consider:

200 x 400

Step 1: Multiply the 2 times the 4

2 x 4 = 8

Step 2: Put all four of the zeros after the 8

80,000

200 x 400= 80,000

Practicing these fast math tricks can help both students and teachers improve their

math skills and become secure in their knowledge of mathematics—and unafraid to work

with numbers in the future.

**Subtracting from 1,000**

Here’s a basic rule to subtract a large number from 1,000: Subtract every number

except the last from 9 and subtract the final number from 10

For example:

1,000 – 556

Step 1: Subtract 5 from 9 = 4

Step 2: Subtract 5 from 9 = 4

Step 3: Subtract 6 from 10 = 4

The answer is 444.

I HOPE YOU LIKE THE TRICKS. THEY ARE VERY SIMPLE JUST YOU NEED TO UNDERSTAND IT PROPERLY. I ALSO TRIED IT.